Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Hyderabad

Archidioecesis Hyderabadensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Thumma Bala, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 19 September 1953
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 25,319 (9,779 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, Sardar Patel Road, Secunderabad-500003, A.P., India
  • Telephone: (040)2780.5545; 2780.5418
  • Fax: 2771.8089

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Hyderabad
1851ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Madras Vicariate Apostolic of Hyderabad (erected)
Diocese of Hyderabad
1 September 1886ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Hyderabad Diocese of Hyderabad
15 June 1928Territory LostDiocese of Hyderabad
Archdiocese of Madras
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bellary (erected)
10 January 1933Territory LostDiocese of Hyderabad Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bezwada (erected)
22 December 1952Territory LostDiocese of Hyderabad Diocese of Warangal (erected)
Archdiocese of Hyderabad
19 September 1953ElevatedDiocese of Hyderabad Archdiocese of Hyderabad
31 May 1976Territory LostArchdiocese of Hyderabad
Diocese of Warangal
Diocese of Nalgonda (erected)
17 December 1977Territory LostDiocese of Amravati
Archdiocese of Hyderabad
Diocese of Aurangabad (erected)
24 June 2005Territory LostDiocese of Belgaum (Bijapur)
Diocese of Bellary (Gulbarga)
Archdiocese of Hyderabad (Bidar)
Diocese of Gulbarga (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Hyderabad
195044,2948,000,000.6%193049903928630ap1951
Archdiocese of Hyderabad
197035,3369,853,852.4%3213457854037219ap1971
198038,78711,160,000.3%3552874459349036ap1981
199066,46912,500,000.5%736814147112367142ap1991
199984,04011,000,000.8%9510920441116161269ap2000
200089,70012,370,000.7%9910820743317090072ap2001
200187,54112,370,000.7%8211619844216779272ap2002
200286,00912,370,000.7%8821230028626191272ap2003
200387,59212,172,000.7%8613522139619182177ap2004
200490,35413,012,000.7%9313122440318380777ap2005
200689,90012,099,000.7%9014323338518676972ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 26 Jun 2013