Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Valentine Allen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

Titular Bishop of Avensa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1909Born
10 Jun 193323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
2 Jul 195445.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
2 Jul 195445.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Avensa
7 Oct 195445.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avensa
7 Oct 197768.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Francis Valentine Allen
Bishop Francis Valentine Allen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToronto

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast