Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anthony Giroux Meagher

Deceased

Archbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1940Born
17 Jun 197231.5Ordained PriestPriest of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
30 Apr 199756.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
30 Apr 199756.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dura
26 Jun 199756.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dura
27 Apr 200261.4AppointedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
14 Jan 200766.1DiedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Anthony Giroux Meagher
Archbishop Anthony Giroux Meagher (born , died ) Archbishop of Kingston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOshawa

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,023
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast