Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Bell Clune

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

Titular Bishop of Lacubaza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1920Born
26 May 194524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
3 May 197958.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
3 May 197958.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacubaza
21 Jun 197958.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lacubaza
27 Dec 199575.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
6 Sep 200786.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Robert Bell Clune (VIAF: 4564436)
Bishop Robert Bell Clune (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToronto

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018