Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Joseph Hundt

Archbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1956 Born
8 May 198225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
11 Feb 200649.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
11 Feb 200649.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tarasa in Byzacena
25 Apr 200649.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarasa in Byzacena
1 Mar 201154.5AppointedBishop of Corner Brook and Labrador, Newfoundland, Canada
13 Apr 201154.6InstalledBishop of Corner Brook and Labrador, Newfoundland, Canada
12 Dec 201862.2AppointedArchbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for Peter Joseph Hundt
Archbishop Peter Joseph Hundt (born ) Archbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHanover
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Hamilton, Diocese of Hamilton, Ontario

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,144
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Dec 2018

Quantcast