Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Armand-Franšios-Marie de Charbonnel, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario

Titular Archbishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto

Member of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1802BornMonistrol-sur-Loire, France
17 Dec 182523.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 185047.3AppointedBishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
26 May 185047.5Ordained BishopBishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
26 Apr 186057.4ResignedBishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
26 Apr 186057.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Oct 186966.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
13 Jan 188178.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
25 Mar 189188.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Armand-Franšios-Marie de Charbonnel:
Archbishop Armand-Franšios-Marie de Charbonnel O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Toronto

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 525, and Page 559

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013