Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Larkin, S.J. †

Deceased

Priest of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1801BornRavensworth, Newcastle-upon-Tyne
26 Aug 182726.5Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
4 May 183231.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
4 May 183231.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
23 Oct 184039.7IncardinatedPriest of Society of Jesus
14 Feb 184948.0AppointedBishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
11 Dec 185857.8DiedPriest of Society of Jesus

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for John Larkin (VIAF: 104510285)
Father John Larkin S.J. (born , died ) Priest of Society of Jesus

  • a priest for 31.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 202, and Page 321
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Aug 2016