Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fergus Patrick McEvay

Deceased

Archbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1852Born
29 Jul 188229.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
27 May 189946.4AppointedBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
6 Aug 189946.6Ordained BishopBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
13 Apr 190855.3AppointedArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
17 Jun 190855.5InstalledArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
10 May 191158.4DiedArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Fergus Patrick McEvay (VIAF: 316945693)
Archbishop Fergus Patrick McEvay (born , died ) Archbishop of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLindsay
Ordained BishopLondon, Diocese of London, Ontario

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 348
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017