Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Petar Antun Rajič

Apostolic Nuncio to Angola

Titular Archbishop of Sarsenterum

Apostolic Nuncio to São Tomé and Príncipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1959 BornToronto, Canada
30 Nov 198627.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
29 Jun 198728.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
2 Dec 200950.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sarsenterum
2 Dec 200950.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kuwait
2 Dec 200950.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bahrain
2 Dec 200950.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Qatar
2 Dec 200950.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Arabian Peninsula
23 Jan 201050.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sarsenterum
27 Mar 201050.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Yemen
27 Mar 201050.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to United Arab Emirates
15 Jun 201556.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Angola
15 Jun 201556.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to São Tomé and Príncipe

MicroData Summary for Petar Antun Rajič:
Archbishop Petar Antun Rajič (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Angola

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Angola.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,557
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 15 Jun 2015