Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark William O’Connell

Auxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Gigthi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1964 Born
27 Jan 199025.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
16 Jun 199025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
3 Jun 201651.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
3 Jun 201651.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gigthi
24 Aug 201652.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gigthi

MicroData Summary for Mark William O’Connell (VIAF: 311223321)
Bishop Mark William O’Connell (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScarborough, Ontario, Canada

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Boston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2016
  • mn/od/c01: CB, 6 Jun 2016
  • c34: CB, 15 Jul 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,081

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast