Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alban (Edward) Quinn, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Sicuani, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1924Born
7 Jun 194924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
12 Jul 197147.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sicuani, Peru
Jul 1999³75.0RetiredApostolic Administrator of Sicuani, Peru
15 Sep 201086.2DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Sicuani, Peru

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alban (Edward) Quinn (VIAF: 43323885)
Father Alban (Edward) Quinn O. Carm. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Sicuani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToronto, Canada

  • a priest for 61.2 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast