Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Walsh

Deceased

Archbishop of Toronto, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1830BornMooncoin, Ireland
1 Nov 185424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
4 Jun 186737.0AppointedBishop of Sandwich, Ontario, Canada
10 Nov 186737.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sandwich, Ontario, Canada
3 Oct 186939.4AppointedBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
13 Aug 188959.2AppointedArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
31 Jul 189868.2DiedArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Walsh:
Archbishop John Walsh (born , died ) Archbishop of Toronto

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 348, and Page 559

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013