Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard John Grecco

Bishop Emeritus of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1946 Born
2 Sep 197226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
5 Dec 199751.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of London, Ontario, Canada
5 Dec 199751.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Uccula
2 Feb 199851.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uccula
27 Apr 200256.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
11 Jul 200963.3AppointedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
21 Sep 200963.5InstalledBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
4 Mar 202175.0RetiredBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada

MicroData Summary for Richard John Grecco
Bishop Richard John Grecco (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Charlottetown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Catharines, Diocese of Saint Catharines, Ontario
Ordained BishopSaint Alfred, Church, Saint Catharines, Diocese of Saint Catharines, Ontario

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Charlottetown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,233
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Mar 2021

Quantcast