Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martin Michael Johnson

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1899Born
14 Jun 192425.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 193637.3AppointedBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
29 Sep 193637.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
27 Nov 195455.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
27 Nov 195455.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cius
11 Mar 196464.9SucceededArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
8 Jan 196969.8ResignedArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
8 Jan 196969.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Civitate
23 Nov 197071.6ResignedTitular Archbishop of Civitate
29 Jan 197575.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Martin Michael Johnson
Archbishop Martin Michael Johnson (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vancouver

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToronto

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast