Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonard James Wall

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1924Born
11 Jun 194924.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 197954.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
3 May 197954.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Leptiminus
21 Jun 197954.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leptiminus
25 Feb 199267.4AppointedArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
8 Apr 199267.5InstalledArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
7 Jun 200075.6RetiredArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
5 Mar 200277.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Leonard James Wall
Archbishop Leonard James Wall (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Winnipeg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWindsor

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast