Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Neil McNeil

Deceased

Archbishop of Toronto, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1851BornHillsborough
12 Apr 187927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Arichat, Nova Scotia, Canada
6 Aug 189543.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Newfoundland (St. George’s), Canada
6 Aug 189543.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
20 Oct 189543.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
28 Feb 190452.3AppointedBishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada
19 Jan 191058.2AppointedArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
10 Apr 191260.4AppointedArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
22 Dec 191261.1InstalledArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
26 May 193482.5DiedArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Neil McNeil:
Archbishop Neil McNeil (born , died ) Archbishop of Toronto

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 416

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013