Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Jude Scicluna

Archbishop of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1959 Born
11 Jul 198627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Malta
6 Oct 201253.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Malta
6 Oct 201253.3AppointedTitular Bishop of San Leone
24 Nov 201253.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of San Leone
18 Oct 201455.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Malta
27 Feb 201555.7AppointedArchbishop of Malta
21 Mar 201555.8InstalledArchbishop of Malta

MicroData Summary for Charles Jude Scicluna (VIAF: 92509618)
Archbishop Charles Jude Scicluna (born ) Archbishop of Malta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToronto, Canada

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Malta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Oct 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,607
  • ab: CB, 18 Oct 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast