Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Joseph Lynch, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1816Born
21 Nov 184125.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
10 Jun 184327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
26 Aug 185943.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
26 Aug 185943.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Echinus
20 Nov 185943.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Echinus
26 Apr 186044.1SucceededBishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
7 Jun 186044.3InstalledBishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
18 Mar 187054.0AppointedArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
12 May 188872.2DiedArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Lynch (VIAF: 78308915)
Archbishop John Joseph Lynch C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClones, County Monaghan, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Toronto, Diocese of Toronto, Ontario

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 256, and Page 559
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1859, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017