Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Anthony Marrocco

Deceased

Bishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1913Born
12 Jun 193824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
1 Dec 195542.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
1 Dec 195542.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Limnae
22 Feb 195642.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limnae
10 Jun 196854.9AppointedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
18 Jul 197562.0DiedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Francis Anthony Marrocco
Bishop Francis Anthony Marrocco (born , died ) Bishop of Peterborough

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeterborough

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1956, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast