Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of London

Dioecesis Londonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ronald Peter Fabbro, C.S.B., Bishop
  • John Michael Sherlock, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • See Transferred: 15 November 1869
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Toronto
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Ontario
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 21,349 (8,246 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Ontario
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: L
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseoflondon.ca/
  • Mailing Address: 1070 Waterloo Street, London, Ontario N6A 3Y2, Canada
  • Telephone: (519)433-0658
  • Fax: 433-0011

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of London
21 February 1855ErectedDiocese of London (erected)
Diocese of Sandwich
2 February 1859Name ChangedDiocese of London Diocese of Sandwich
Diocese of London
15 November 1869See TransferredDiocese of Sandwich Diocese of London

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of London
1950131,755711,32918.5%187722595081221,096105ap1951
1966207,164966,29121.4%272142414500167136172ap1967
1970265,8611,038,34525.6%2601183787031931,016144ap1971
1976298,3801,120,70026.6%240134374797188856144ap1977
1980318,9571,207,00026.4%238117355898144777144ap1981
1990369,8931,237,00029.9%240983381,094122555147ap1991
1999444,7271,389,77232.0%211772881,544283473147ap2000
2000449,1741,403,66932.0%204772811,59882473148ap2001
2001455,0131,421,91632.0%209722811,61977444148ap2004
2004622,1381,944,18232.0%214702842,190475444146ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Apr 2014