Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Sesé, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta

Note/Previous Titular See: (Eugenio de la Santísima Trinidad)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1750BornCrivillén, Spain
28 Sep 180150.8AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
30 Jan 180352.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
31 Oct 180352.9DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Sesé:
Bishop Eugenio Sesé C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 255
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 123, Number 651

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013