Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Sánchez Cerrudo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1757BornBéjar, Spain
20 Aug 180447.1AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
20 Nov 180851.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
4 Aug 181053.0DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Miguel Sánchez Cerrudo:
Bishop Miguel Sánchez Cerrudo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1808, Number 23
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 255
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 128, Number 682

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015