Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Socorro y San Gil

Dioecesis Succursensis et Sancti Aegidii



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 19 January 1928
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bucaramanga
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 6,734 (2,601 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Carrera 9, N. 12-42, San Gil [Santander], Colombia
  • Telephone: (77)724.22.05; 724.30.11
  • Fax: 724.22.04

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Socorro
20 March 1895ErectedDiocese of Nueva Pamplona Diocese of Socorro (erected)
Diocese of Socorro y San Gil
19 January 1928Name ChangedDiocese of Socorro Diocese of Socorro y San Gil
2 April 1928Territory LostDiocese of Nueva Pamplona
Diocese of Socorro y San Gil
Territorial Prelature of Río Magdalena (erected)
14 May 2003Territory LostDiocese of Socorro y San Gil Diocese of Vélez (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Socorro y San Gil
1950345,406345,546100.0%6025854,0634720950ap1951
1966418,748424,15998.7%78231014,1462321560ap1967
1970402,000410,00098.0%93131063,7921931859ap1971
1976300,000390,00076.9%856913,296835264ap1977
1980460,500462,60099.5%827895,174926064ap1981
1990397,000407,00097.5%94121063,7451430969ap1991
1999429,350445,70096.3%12781353,1801625773ap2000
2000429,350445,70096.3%13081383,1111625773ap2001
2001429,350445,70096.3%13381413,0451625773ap2002
2002426,279439,47997.0%13861442,9601321973ap2003
2003255,217255,67799.8%11041142,2381116846ap2004
2004246,749254,38197.0%874912,711716446ap2005
2010264,000274,00096.4%10351082,444611747ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013