Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Fernández de Piedrahita

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹Born
27 Feb 166844.1AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
1669¹45.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
16 Nov 167652.8AppointedBishop of Panamá
29 Mar 168864.2DiedBishop of Panamá

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lucas Fernández de Piedrahita
Bishop Lucas Fernández de Piedrahita (born 1624, died ) Bishop of Panamá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Fe de Bogotá

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 258, and Page 305
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast