Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorius Jacobus Pastrana

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹BornBogota
24 Apr 168460.3AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
25 Mar 168561.2Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
26 Oct 169066.8DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorius Jacobus Pastrana:
Bishop Gregorius Jacobus Pastrana (born 1624, died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 258
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015