Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Serrano

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1777Born
31 Aug 180023.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 183658.4AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
31 Jul 183658.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
12 May 185274.7DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Luis Serrano
Bishop José Luis Serrano (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMompós

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 255
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,836, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast