Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Baños y Sotomayor

Deceased

Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1637²Born
13 Sep 167740.6AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
21 Nov 167740.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
2 Dec 168245.9SelectedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
15 Feb 168346.1ConfirmedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
15 May 170669.3DiedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Baños y Sotomayor
Bishop Diego de Baños y Sotomayor (born 1637, died ) Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Peru

  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 258, and Page 409
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 217, Number 1,349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast