Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Santamaría Cevallos, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1740BornJaén, Spain
17 Apr 179857.7AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
8 Jul 179857.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
10 Oct 180161.2DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Diego Santamaría Cevallos
Bishop Diego Santamaría Cevallos O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 118, Number 617
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016