Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvador Bermúdez y Becerra

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1680¹BornMedellin, Colombia
170424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Marta, Colombia
18 Jun 173151.4AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
22 Nov 173353.8Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
27 Dec 174161.9SelectedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
28 Feb 174262.1ConfirmedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
10 Mar 174666.1SelectedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
14 Jun 174666.4ConfirmedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
29 Dec 174666.9DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvador Bermúdez y Becerra:
Archbishop Salvador Bermúdez y Becerra (born 1680, died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,038
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 177, and Page 323
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 341
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015