Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Celedón

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1833BornSan-Juan-de-Cesar
23 Sep 186532.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 189159.0AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
22 May 189259.4Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
10 Dec 190269.9DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Rafael Celedón:
Bishop Rafael Celedón (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013