Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas García Miranda

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587²Born
2 Jun 162538.4SelectedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
15 Dec 162538.9ConfirmedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
1626²39.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
11 Mar 162942.1DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lucas García Miranda
Bishop Lucas García Miranda (born 1587, died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBujalance, Spain

  • a bishop for 3.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 149, Number 946
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 233
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast