Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ignacio Mijares Solórzano y Tobar

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1690¹Born
7 Sep 174050.6SelectedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
11 Nov 174050.8ConfirmedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
27 Aug 174151.6Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
21 May 174252.3DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Ignacio Mijares Solórzano y Tobar
Bishop José Ignacio Mijares Solórzano y Tobar (born 1690, died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaracas, Venezuela

  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 60, Number 274
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 48
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast