Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Valledupar

Dioecesis Valleduparensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 25 April 1969
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Barranquilla
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 21,627 (8,353 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Carrera 7 N. 15-26, Valledupar, Cesar, Colombia
  • Telephone: (5)5744.168; 5743.167
  • Fax: 5708.865

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Valledupar
4 December 1952ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Goajira Vicariate Apostolic of Valledupar (erected)
Diocese of Valledupar
25 April 1969ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Valledupar Diocese of Valledupar
17 January 2006Territory LostDiocese of Santa Marta
Diocese of Valledupar
Diocese of El Banco (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Valledupar
1966248,920253,44898.2%1314279,21967721ap1967
Diocese of Valledupar
1970305,480312,14597.9%16143010,182171320ap1971
1976405,000410,00098.8%15112615,576158623ap1977
1980450,000456,00098.7%21123313,636158523ap1981
1990624,000635,00098.3%3133418,35288223ap1991
1999532,000632,25884.1%3854312,37259726ap2000
2000530,000640,00082.8%4164711,276610126ap2001
2001530,000640,00082.8%4264811,04169626ap2002
2002530,000640,00082.8%4565110,39269526ap2003
2003530,000650,00081.5%4645010,60049654ap2004
2004650,000800,00081.3%5455911,01666755ap2005
2010606,000736,00082.3%646708,657137357ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Aug 2014