Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Corderiña Vega, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornLeón, Spain
16 Dec 163061.0AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
1631²61.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
164070.0ResignedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
14 Jan 164272.0SelectedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
26 May 164272.4ConfirmedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
1649¹79.0DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Corderiña Vega:
Bishop Antonio Corderiña Vega O.S.A. , Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a bishop for 18.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 199, and Page 233
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 155, Number 983

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014