Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de la Cruz, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Aug 1656SelectedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
25 Feb 1658ConfirmedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
24 Apr 1660DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Francisco de la Cruz:
Bishop Francisco de la Cruz O.P. (died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 233
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 189, Number 1,186
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015