Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Monroy y Meneses, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Marta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1673BornTalavera de la Reina, Spain
21 Jan 171541.2AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
14 Apr 171541.4Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
9 Mar 171642.3InstalledBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
1 Sep 173864.8ResignedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
1744²70.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Santa Marta, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Monroy y Meneses:
Bishop Antonio Monroy y Meneses O. de M. (born , died 1744) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Marta

  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 258
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 32, Number 95
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015