Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Algüero Ribera, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1750BornValladolid
16 May 180352.8AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
25 Jul 180353.0Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
20 Sep 181464.1SelectedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
19 Dec 181464.4ConfirmedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
30 Mar 181665.6DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Algüero Ribera:
Bishop Lorenzo Algüero Ribera O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 218, and Page 341
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 124, Number 657

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013