Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo Canubio Alberto, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1804BornJerez de la Frontera
Jun 1827³22.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Sep 184742.9SelectedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
17 Dec 184743.2ConfirmedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
16 Apr 184843.5Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
5 Dec 186460.1DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingo Canubio Alberto:
Bishop Domingo Canubio Alberto O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 510
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 154, Number 844

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013