Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Teruel y Albarracín

Dioecesis Terulensis et Albarracinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 11 August 1984
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Zaragoza
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Spain
  • Square Kilometers: 11,867 (4,583 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Apartado 12, Plaza Venerable Frances de Aranda 3, 44001 Teruel, Espana
  • Telephone: 978.619.950
  • Fax: 978.619.951

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Teruel
31 July 1577ErectedArchdiocese of Zaragoza Diocese of Teruel (erected)
Diocese of Teruel (-Albarracín)
7 September 1851UnitedDiocese of Albarracin
Diocese of Teruel
Diocese of Teruel (-Albarracín)
Diocese of Teruel y Albarracín
11 August 1984Name ChangedDiocese of Teruel (-Albarracín) Diocese of Teruel y Albarracín

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Teruel (-Albarracín)
1950100,787100,795100.0%1371615365828185136ap1951
1970127,720127,720100.0%2204126148997266252ap1971
1980100,345100,49499.9%17319192522145266261ap1981
Diocese of Teruel y Albarracín
199098,01098,10299.9%1481616459744234261ap1991
199988,36288,70999.6%1332015357740202262ap2000
200086,98387,29499.6%1331915257233201262ap2001
200186,35286,96899.3%1311915057541193262ap2002
200289,63190,62598.9%1291914860542179262ap2003
200384,32485,82398.3%1281414259336169262ap2004
200487,93289,53398.2%1251514062830154262ap2005
201089,75093,60095.9%1051512074737113262ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Dec 2013