Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Reig Pla

Bishop of Alcalá de Henares


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1947 BornCocentaina
8 Jul 197124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
22 Feb 199648.6AppointedBishop of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana, Spain
14 Apr 199648.8Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe-Castellón de la Plana, Spain
24 Sep 200558.2AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
19 Nov 200558.4InstalledBishop of Cartagena (en España)
7 Mar 200961.7AppointedBishop of Alcalá de Henares, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Reig Pla:
Bishop Juan Antonio Reig Pla (born ) Bishop of Alcalá de Henares

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alcalá de Henares.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2005
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,713

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013