Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Gabaldá Guasch, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1589Born
15 Mar 165262.6SelectedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
14 Oct 165263.2ConfirmedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
19 May 166070.8DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Gabaldá Guasch
Bishop Francisco Gabaldá Guasch O.S.H. (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCabanes

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 182, Number 1,132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 311
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,652, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast