Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Barrachina Estevan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1912Born
13 Jul 194128.7Ordained PriestPriest of Segorbe, Spain
31 Mar 195441.4AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
29 Jun 195441.6Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
12 May 198976.5RetiredBishop of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain
13 Oct 200895.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Orihuela-Alicante, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pablo Barrachina Estevan
Bishop Pablo Barrachina Estevan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orihuela-Alicante

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJérica

  • a priest for 67.2 years
  • a bishop for 54.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast