Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Ginés Casanova

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1555³BornValencia
14 Mar 158731.6Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
1 Feb 161054.5AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
9 May 161054.7Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
27 Mar 163579.6DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ginés Casanova:
Bishop Pedro Ginés Casanova (died ) Bishop of Segorbe

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 310
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 126, Number 803
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015