Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luis Juan Cardinal del Milà

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1432¹Born
29 Jan 145321.0AppointedBishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain
20 Feb 145624.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
17 Sep 145624.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Sep 145624.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
7 Oct 145927.7AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
23 Feb 146129.1InstalledBishop of Lérida, Spain
10 Sep 150775.6DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Juan del Milà
Luis Juan Cardinal del Milà (born 1432, died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJàtiva
Death PlaceBelgida, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a cardinal for 51.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1456
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1453, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast