Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julián Sanz Palanco

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1761BornCampo Real
1786¹24.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 182563.5SelectedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
21 Mar 182563.6ConfirmedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
3 Jul 182563.9Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
1 Apr 183775.7DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Julián Sanz Palanco:
Bishop Julián Sanz Palanco (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 341
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 143, Number 774

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013