Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Íńigo Vallterra Sánchez de Heredia

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1362AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
3 Mar 1369AppointedBishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain
28 May 1380AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
17 Feb 1407DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Íńigo Vallterra Sánchez de Heredia
Archbishop Íńigo Vallterra Sánchez de Heredia (died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 443, and Page 479
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast