Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Gómez Haedo

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1757BornViañes del Valle de Carranza
15 Dec 178326.1AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
1 Feb 178426.2Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
1 Nov 180952.0DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Gómez Haedo
Bishop Lorenzo Gómez Haedo (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 100, Number 519
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 4
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 374

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Feb 2016