Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Sanahuja y Marcé

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cartagena (en España)

Titular Bishop of Guardialfiera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1890Born
14 Mar 191625.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Aug 194453.6AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
19 Nov 194453.9Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
13 May 195059.4AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
22 Apr 196978.3RetiredBishop of Cartagena (en España)
22 Apr 196978.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Guardialfiera
8 Aug 197079.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Ramón Sanahuja y Marcé
Bishop Ramón Sanahuja y Marcé (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cartagena (en España)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBañeras

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast