Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Antonio La Dueña Cisneros

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1753BornVillanueva de la Fuente
24 Jul 179743.7AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
22 Oct 179743.9Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
23 Sep 181662.8AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
8 Nov 182168.0DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio La Dueña Cisneros:
Bishop Francisco Antonio La Dueña Cisneros (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 341
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 115, Number 601

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013