Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio María Massanet y Verd

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1865Born
22 Dec 188823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain
19 Dec 190742.7AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
23 May 190843.1Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
16 Oct 191146.5DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio María Massanet y Verd
Bishop Antonio María Massanet y Verd (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalma de Mallorca

  • a priest for 22.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast